Strannard v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Strannard
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00387
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by David Strannard. (Ovruchesky, Clark)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy J. Fabillaran for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Pursuant to the representations of Plaintiff, the court has determined this case has settled as to defendant, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. only. (See ECF No. #10 ) Dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 6/18/2019. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines/hearings as to defendant, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. are VACATED. (Text Only Entry) (Fabillaran, J)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT Between Plaintiff and only Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. by David Strannard. (Ovruchesky, Clark)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Woo, Donna)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Woo, Donna added.(Woo, Donna)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/4/2019 ADDING attorney Heather M. Shumaker, PHV for Trans Union LLC. (Washington, S)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Booth, Eileen)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Trans Union LLC for attorney Heather M. Shumaker to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Booth, Eileen T. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8195066) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Booth, Eileen)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #1 by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Attorney Ng, Tiffany F. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ng, Tiffany) Modified on 3/25/2019 (Reader, L).
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 7/18/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Trans Union LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Clark Ovruchesky* *C.O. Law, APC* *3148 Midway Dr. Suite 203* *San Diego, CA 92110*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by David Strannard. Attorney Ovruchesky, Clark added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8140843) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ovruchesky, Clark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strannard v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany F. Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Heather M. Shumaker, PHV
Represented By: Eileen T. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Strannard
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?