Stahl v. Klotz et al

Plaintiff: Dusty Stahl
Defendant: Dana Elmore, Jana Giron, Amee Trotter, Robert C. Klotz, Heather Gardella and Dawn Harmon
Case Number: 2:2019cv00496
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/08/19 ORDERING that all discovery shall be completed by 02/28/20; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 03/27/20 with any supplemental designations due by 04/17/20; Expert discovery shall be completed by 05/18/20; Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 06/26/20; this matter is REFERRED to VDRP to take place in September 2019; a Final Pretrial Conference date will be set after the resolution of any dispositive motions, or passage of the dispositive motion cutoff, with a trial date being determined at the pretrial conference. The parties should be prepared to confirm a trial date within 60 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. Objections due within 14 calendar days (cc: VDRP). (Benson, A.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING and SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/28/2019. Plaintiff's Counsel, James McGlamery, present. Defendants' Counsel, Jennifer Perkell, present. After hearing oral argument as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #5 ), the court took the matter under submission. The court and counsel also discussed case scheduling. A written order will issue. Court Reporter: Kacy Barajas. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY by Dana Elmore, et al., re #7 Opposition to Motion. (Perkell, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Dana Elmore, Heather Gardella, Jana Giron, Dawn Harmon, Robert C. Klotz, Amee Trotter. (Perkell, Jennifer)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference and Motion Hearing as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #5 ) set for 5/31/2019 is VACATED and RESET for 6/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Motion related briefing deadlines are reset as provided by Local Rule 230. The parties shall file a joint status report no less than seven days prior to the new date of the status conference. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 OPPOSITION by Dusty Stahl to #5 Amended Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McGlamery, James)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 8/1/2019 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. (Text Only Entry), (Schultz, C)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED MOTION to DISMISS amending #4 MOTION to DISMISS by Dana Elmore, Heather Gardella, Jana Giron, Dawn Harmon, Robert C. Klotz, Amee Trotter. Attorney Perkell, Jennifer G. added. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Perkell, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by Dana Elmore, Dawn Harmon, Robert C. Klotz. Attorney Perkell, Jennifer G. added. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Perkell, Jennifer)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Washington, S)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Dana Elmore, Heather Gardella, Jana Giron, Dawn Harmon, Robert C. Klotz, Amee Trotter* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James McGlamery* *The Law Offices Of James E. Mcglamery* *775 University Avenue* *Sacramento, CA 95825*. (Washington, S)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dusty Stahl. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8169364) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGlamery, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stahl v. Klotz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Elmore
Represented By: Jennifer G. Perkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Giron
Represented By: Jennifer G. Perkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amee Trotter
Represented By: Jennifer G. Perkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Klotz
Represented By: Jennifer G. Perkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Gardella
Represented By: Jennifer G. Perkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Harmon
Represented By: Jennifer G. Perkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dusty Stahl
Represented By: James McGlamery
Represented By: James E. McGlamery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?