Xiong v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.

Plaintiff: Mai Katy Xiong
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00508
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to STAY by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linh T. Hua, #2 Proposed Order)(Sokolova, Nadejda) Modified on 6/4/2019 (Kaminski, H).
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to STRIKE by Mai Katy Xiong. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Briscoe, John)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/28/2019: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/19/2020. Supplemental disclosure and disclosure of any rebuttal experts shall be made by 7/3/2020. Discovery due by 8/7/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/15/2020. Hearing on such motions shall be on 10/13/2020, at 01:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2020, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021, at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez. The parties estimate a trial length of approximately 7 days. Objections due within 7 days of the date of the filing of this Order. (York, M)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Mai Katy Xiong. (Briscoe, John)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Linh Hua on behalf of G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.. Attorney Hua, Linh added. (Hua, Linh)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED #7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. (Sokolova, Nadejda) Modified on 4/22/2019 (Benson, A.).
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.. (Sokolova, Nadejda)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.. Attorney Sokolova, Nadejda added.(Sokolova, Nadejda)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rachael Allgaier on behalf of Mai Katy Xiong. Attorney Allgaier, Rachael added. (Allgaier, Rachael)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Briscoe, John)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John P. Briscoe* *Mayall Hurley, PC* *2453 Grand Canal Boulevard* *Stockton, California 95207-8253*. (Reader, L)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. by Mai Katy Xiong. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8174256) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Briscoe, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiong v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mai Katy Xiong
Represented By: Robert Joshua Wasserman
Represented By: John Paul Briscoe
Represented By: Rachael Allgaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Linh Hua
Represented By: Nadejda Sokolova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?