Covarrubias v. TransUnion, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Erika Covarrubias
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Flagstar Bank, FSB, TransUnion, LLC, Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00549
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to #10 First Amended Complaint by Flagstar Bank, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sharma, Dhruv) Modified on 7/2/2019 (York, M).
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as to Freedom Mortgage Corporation by Erika Covarrubias. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 7/2/2019 (York, M).
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT with Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation only by Erika Covarrubias. Dispositional Docs due by 7/5/2019. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 6/12/2019 (Benson, A.).
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Bank of America only by Erika Covarrubias. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 6/12/2019 (Benson, A.).
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER by TransUnion, LLC.(Brady, Scott)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Erika Covarrubias (Angelo, Joseph)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT with Defendant Bank of America, N.A. by Erika Covarrubias. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 5/22/2019 (Washington, S).
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #10 First Amended Complaint by No More Than 28 Days by Flagstar Bank, FSB. Attorney Sharma, Dhruv M. added. (Sharma, Dhruv) Modified on 5/21/2019 (Washington, S).
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Flagstar Bank, FSB, Freedom Mortgage Corporation, TransUnion, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC by Erika Covarrubias. Attorney Angelo, Joseph added.(Angelo, Joseph)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Echevestre, Nicolas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nicolas Joshua Echevestre on behalf of Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Attorney Echevestre, Nicolas Joshua added. (Echevestre, Nicolas)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/9/19. Added attorney Scott E. Brady, PHV for TransUnion, LLC. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Booth, Eileen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by TransUnion, LLC for attorney Scott E. Brady to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Booth, Eileen T. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8251056) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Booth, Eileen)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: TransUnion, LLC served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Angelo, Joseph)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bank of America, N.A., Flagstar Bank, FSB, Freedom Mortgage Corporation, TransUnion, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Scott Matthew Johnson* *Gale Angelo Johnson & Pruett, P.C.* *1430 Blue Oaks Blvd., Suite 250* *Roseville, CA 95747*. (Kaminski, H)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Erika Covarrubias. Attorney Johnson, Scott Matthew added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8184574) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Scott) Modified on 3/28/2019 (Kaminski, H).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covarrubias v. TransUnion, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: Dhruv M. Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady, PHV
Represented By: Eileen T. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nicolas Joshua Echevestre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Covarrubias
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?