Vaughn v. Equifax Information Services LLC

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Vaughn
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00555
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/15/2019: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #6 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1), this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Elizabeth Vaughn. (Ovruchesky, Clark)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/4/2019: Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement (ECF No. #4 ), the Court determined this case has settled. In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, dispositional documents are to be filed on or before 8/5/2019. Accordingly, all other deadlines and hearings are VACATED. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Elizabeth Vaughn. (Ovruchesky, Clark)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Becknal, R)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Equifax Information Services LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Clark Ovruchesky* *2404 Broadway, Suite 150* *San Diego, CA 92102*. (Becknal, R)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Elizabeth Vaughn. Attorney Ovruchesky, Clark added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8187826) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ovruchesky, Clark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Vaughn
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?