Neasham & Kramer LLP v. Neff et al
Plaintiff: Neasham & Kramer LLP
Defendant: Northern Nevada Care, Inc. and Stephen Neff
Case Number: 2:2019cv00565
Filed: March 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Northern Nevada Care, Inc. served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Kramer, Patricia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Stephen Neff served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Kramer, Patricia)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of IMPOSITION of STAY by Stephen Neff. Attorney Sweet, Austin Kent added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sweet, Austin) Modified on 6/4/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Stephen Neff, Northern Nevada Care, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patricia Kramer* *Neasham & Kramer LLP* *340 Palladio Parkway, Ste. 535* *Folsom, CA 95630*. (Benson, A.)
March 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Neasham & Kramer LLP (Kramer, Patricia)
March 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Neasham & Kramer LLP. Attorney Kramer, Patricia added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8188036) (Kramer, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neasham & Kramer LLP v. Neff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Nevada Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Neff
Represented By: Austin Kent Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neasham & Kramer LLP
Represented By: Patricia Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?