(PS)Wolpert v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: David Alexander Wolpert
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00590
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/10/19 ORDERING that plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, within 14 days, why the failure to file a Second Amended Complaint should not result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Kaminski, H)
July 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order, served on David Alexander Wolpert. (Kaminski, H)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/4/19 DISMISSING #5 First Amended Complaint with leave to amend and GRANTING plaintiff 30 days to file a Second Amended Complaint. (Coll, A)
June 5, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on David Alexander Wolpert. (Coll, A)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Starbucks Corporation by David Alexander Wolpert.(Washington, S)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 EVIDENCE of SLANDER by David Alexander Wolpert (Benson, A.)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/5/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint which complies with the instructions given above. (York, M)
April 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on David Alexander Wolpert. (York, M)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David Alexander Wolpert. (Reader, L)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Starbucks Corporation by David Alexander Wolpert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reader, L)
April 4, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS)Wolpert v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Alexander Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?