EMED Technologies Corporation v. Repro-Med Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emed Technologies Corporation
Defendant: Andrew I Sealfon and Repro-Med Systems, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Judge T John Ward
Case Number: 2:2019cv00598
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
2 Judge: John A Mendez
3 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #59 Substitution of Attorney Order served on Jennifer Parker Ainsworth, NCAED. (York, M)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/12/2019 SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS Robert D. Swanson, Robert M. Isackson, PHV, Matthew L. Kaufman, PHV, and Henry A. Gabathuler, PHV in place and instead of Christopher M. Jackson, PHV, James G. Sawtell, PHV, and Jennifer Parker Ainsworth, NCAED to represent Andrew I Sealfon. (York, M)
June 7, 2019 Filing 58 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Andrew I Sealfon. (Swanson, Robert)
May 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #56 Pro Hac Vice Order, #55 Pro Hac Vice Order, #57 Pro Hac Vice Order served on Jennifer Parker Ainsworth NCAED. (Huang, H)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/15/2019. Added attorney Matthew L. Kaufman, PHV for Repro-Med Systems, Inc. (Huang, H)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/15/2019. Added attorney Robert M. Isackson, PHV for Repro-Med Systems, Inc. (Huang, H)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/15/2019. Added attorney Henry A. Gabathuler, PHV for Repro-Med Systems, Inc. (Huang, H)
May 13, 2019 PAYMENT for #54 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8259263. (Swanson, Robert)
May 13, 2019 PAYMENT for #53 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8259253. (Swanson, Robert)
May 13, 2019 PAYMENT for #52 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8259236. (Swanson, Robert)
May 13, 2019 Filing 54 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. for attorney Matthew L. Kaufman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Swanson, Robert)
May 13, 2019 Filing 53 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. for attorney Henry A. Gabathuler to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Swanson, Robert)
May 13, 2019 Filing 52 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. for attorney Robert M. Isackson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Swanson, Robert)
May 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #51 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Jennifer Parker Ainsworth NCAED. (Kastilahn, A)
May 13, 2019 Filing 51 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
May 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #50 Related Case Order served on Jennifer Parker Ainsworth NCAED. (Kastilahn, A)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/10/19 ORDERING that t the action denominated 2:19-cv-00598-JAM-DB is REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney, and the caption shall read 2:19-cv-00598-TLN-CKD. Any dates currently set in 2:19-cv-00598-JAM-DB are hereby VACATED, and the parties are ordered to re-file any pending motions before this Court. The Clerk is to issue the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Kastilahn, A)
May 8, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:13-cv-01957 by Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. (Swanson, Robert)
May 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #48 Substitution of Attorney Order served on Jennifer Parker Ainsworth NCAED. (York, M)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/2/2019 SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Robert D. Swanson as counsel of record in place of Attorneys Jessica Pauline Gans Newman, James G. Sawtelle, PHV, Stanley M. Gibson, and Christopher M. Jackson, PHV. (York, M)
May 2, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. re #46 Substitution of Attorney - Proposed. Attorney Swanson, Robert D. added. (Swanson, Robert)
May 2, 2019 Filing 46 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. (Swanson, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Jennifer Ainsworth and Request for Removal from Electronic Notification by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. (Gibson, Stanley) Modified on 5/1/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 30, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:13-cv-01957-GEB-CKD, 2:15-cv-01167-JRG-RSP, 18-cv-05880 (LGS) by Emed Technologies Corporation. (Ramey, III, William)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/29/19. Added Pro Hac Vice Attorney William P. Ramey, III for Plaintiff Emed Technologies Corporation. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 29, 2019 Filing 42 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Emed Technologies Corporation for attorney William P. Ramey III to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8235729) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Thomas, John) Duplicate Pro Hac payment, refunded receipt 0972-8235729 Modified on 5/2/2019 (Woodson, A).
April 29, 2019 Filing 41 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Emed Technologies Corporation for attorney William P. Ramey III to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8235707) (Thomas, John)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/26/2019. Attorney James G. Sawtelle added for Repro-Med Systems, Inc. (Huang, H)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/26/2019. Attorney Christopher M. Jackson added for Repro-Med Systems, Inc. (Huang, H)
April 29, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John B. Thomas on behalf of Emed Technologies Corporation. Attorney Thomas, John B. added. (Thomas, John)
April 26, 2019 Filing 37 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. for attorney James G. Sawtelle to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8231521) (Gibson, Stanley)
April 26, 2019 Filing 36 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. for attorney Christopher M. Jackson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8231476) (Gibson, Stanley)
April 25, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jessica Pauline Gans Newman on behalf of Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Attorney Newman, Jessica Pauline Gans added. (Newman, Jessica)
April 25, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stanley M. Gibson on behalf of Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Attorney Gibson, Stanley M. added. (Gibson, Stanley)
April 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 33 Clerk's Notice, #30 Civil New Case Documents for JAM, #31 Clerk's Notice, and 32 Minute Order served on Jennifer Parker Ainsworth NCAED. (Donati, J)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE: All Attorneys were notified on 4/8/2019 by #31 Clerk's Notice that no attorney on the case was admitted to practice and that the attorneys would need to have CAED Admitted Counsel file Pro Hac Vice Applications and Proposed Orders on their behalf. Counsel has not complied with the Notice. Counsel is also reminded and referred to EDCA Local Rule 123 with regard to the duties of counsel in the filing of a notice of related cases. Notice of Related Cases and Pro Hac Vice Applications and payments are due within 5 days of the date of this notice. Failure to comply with the Clerks Notice may result in an Order to Show Cause issued by District Judge John A. Mendez. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J)
April 8, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are reminded and referred to EDCA Local Rule 123 with regard to the duties of counsel in the filing of a notice of related cases. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY)(Vine, H)
April 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #30 Civil New Case Documents for JAM, #31 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction, served on Jennifer Parker Ainsworth, Christopher M. Jackson, William P Ramey III, James G. Sawtelle. (Marrujo, C)
April 8, 2019 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE DIRECTING attorneys William P Ramey, Christopher M. Jackson, James G. Sawtelle, and Jennifer Parker Ainsworth to submit the Pro Hac Vice Application to practice in the Eastern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Application) (Marrujo, C)
April 8, 2019 Filing 30 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
April 8, 2019 Filing 29 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00163.
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #26 Report and Recommendations. Defendants Motion to Dismiss is DENIED and the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the Eastern District of California, Sacramento Division. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/19. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/15/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2018 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products, Andrew I Sealfon. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (bga, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #24 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/1/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products, Andrew I Sealfon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Protective Order))(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Hon. T. John Ward, 1507 Bill Owens Parkway, P.O. Box 1231, Longview, Texas 75606, telephone number 903/757-6400, fax number 903/757-2323 and email tjw@wsfirm.com, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/30/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
October 30, 2018 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2019., Discovery due by 5/3/2019., Motions due by 7/11/2019., Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2018. Jury Selection set for 8/19/2019 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2019., Discovery due by 5/3/2019., Motions due by 7/11/2019., Jury Selection set for 8/19/2019 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Joinder of Parties due by 4/8/2019., Mediation Completion due by 5/23/2019 (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/30/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Judge T. John Ward, filed by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products, Andrew I Sealfon. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed DCO))(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/23/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2018 in chambers with no recording. Harry Laxton present for plaintiff. Jennifer Ainsworth for defendant. Proposed deadlines for Docket Control Order and Discovery Order discussed. Custom protective order to be submitted. (bga, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
October 23, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by EMED Technologies Corporation Deposition Notice (Ramey, William) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2018 02:50 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/14/18. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS SUR-REPLY REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by EMED Technologies Corporation. (Ramey, William) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products, Andrew I Sealfon. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 8/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/6/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products, Andrew I Sealfon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND filed by EMED Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M. Jackson on behalf of Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products, Andrew I Sealfon. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6863687. (Jackson, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James G. Sawtelle on behalf of Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products, Andrew I Sealfon. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6863653. (Sawtelle, James) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 7/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/2/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS ANDY SEALFON AND REPRO-MED SYSTEMS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS by EMED Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products, Andrew I Sealfon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EMED Technologies Corporation. Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products waiver sent on 4/26/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; Andrew I Sealfon waiver sent on 4/26/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products, Andrew I Sealfon, filed by EMED Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ramey, William) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by EMED Technologies Corporation CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (Ramey, William) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/30/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products, Andrew I Sealfon. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
April 23, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint against Repro-Med Systems, Inc. d/b/a RMS Medical Products ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6750767.), filed by EMED Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ramey, William) [Transferred from txed on 4/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMED Technologies Corporation v. Repro-Med Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew I Sealfon
Represented By: Christopher M. Jackson
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: James G. Sawtelle
Represented By: Robert M. Isackson, PHV
Represented By: Henry A. Gabathuler, PHV
Represented By: Matthew L. Kaufman, PHV
Represented By: James G. Sawtelle, PHV
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth, NCAED
Represented By: Christopher M. Jackson, PHV
Represented By: Robert D. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repro-Med Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Jackson
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: James G. Sawtelle
Represented By: Robert M. Isackson, PHV
Represented By: Henry A. Gabathuler, PHV
Represented By: Matthew L. Kaufman, PHV
Represented By: James G. Sawtelle, PHV
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth, NCAED
Represented By: Jessica Pauline Gans Newman
Represented By: Christopher M. Jackson, PHV
Represented By: Stanley M. Gibson
Represented By: Robert D. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emed Technologies Corporation
Represented By: William P Ramey, III
Represented By: John B. Thomas
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Judge T John Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?