Baird et al v. Becerra
Plaintiff: Mark Baird and Richard Gallardo
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 2:2019cv00617
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Status Conference held on October 9, 2019, before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Court Reporter Kacy Barajas, Phone number 916-426-7640 E-mail kbarajas.csr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 11/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020. (Barajas, K)
October 11, 2019 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Mark Baird for proceedings held on October 9, 2019 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Court Reporter Kacy Barajas. (Barajas, K)
October 9, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING and SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/9/2019. Plaintiffs' Counsel, Amy Bellantoni, present. Defendant's Counsel, R. Matthew Wise, present. The court heard oral argument as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF no. #10 ) and Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #14 ). The court and counsel also discussed case scheduling. After careful consideration of the parties' arguments, the court took the matters under submission. A written order will issue. Court Reporter: Kacy Barajas. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 8, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to unforseen circumstances and on the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference and Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2019 is VACATED and RESET for 10/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
October 2, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Amy L. Bellantoni in support of #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Bellantoni, Amy) Modified on 10/2/2019 (Benson, A.).
October 2, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo in support of #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clayton Cramer, #2 Declaration of Charles "Chuck" Haggard, #3 Declaration of Mark Baird, #4 Declaration of Richard Gallardo)(Bellantoni, Amy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY by Xavier Becerra in support of #10 Motion to Dismiss. (Wise, R.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo. (Bellantoni, Amy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of #22 Notice of Intent by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo. (Bellantoni, Amy) Modified on 9/10/2019 (Benson, A.).
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Xavier Becerra to #22 Notice of Intent. (Wise, R.) Modified on 9/9/2019 (Benson, A.).
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of INTENT to present sworn testimony at the 10/8/2019 #14 preliminary injunction hearing by Plaintiffs Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo. (Bellantoni, Amy) Modified on 9/9/2019 (Benson, A.).
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference and Motion Hearing as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF Nos. #10 and #14 ) set for 9/6/2019 is VACATED and RESET for 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Motion related briefing deadlines are reset as provided by Local Rule 230. The parties shall file a joint status report no less than seven days prior to the new date of the status conference. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 OPPOSITION by Xavier Becerra to #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Matthew Wise, #2 Declaration of Former Covina Chief of Police Kim Raney)(Wise, R.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 OPPOSITION by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo to #10 Motion to Dismiss. (Bellantoni, Amy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED #15 MEMORANDUM of POINTS in SUPPORT of #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo. (Bellantoni, Amy) Modified on 7/17/2019 (York, M).
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Plaintiffs' Request to File an Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. (See ECF Nos. #14 and #16 ) Plaintiffs' amended filing shall be filed forthwith. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST to FILE Amended #14 Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo. (Bellantoni, Amy) Modified on 7/12/2019 (Benson, A.).
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 (DISREGARD; REFER TO AMENDED FILING AT ECF NO. #18 ) MEMORANDUM by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo in support of #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Bellantoni, Amy) Modified on 7/9/2019 (Benson, A.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy L. Bellantoni, #2 Declaration of Richard Gallardo, #3 Declaration of Mark Baird)(Bellantoni, Amy)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/27/19 RESCHEDULING the Status Conference and hearing on Defendants' #10 Motion for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. And APPROVING the Parties' briefing and hearing Schedule: 7/8/19: Plaintiffs to file preliminary injunction motion. 7/29/19: Plaintiffs to file opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss. 8/2/19: Defendant to file opposition to Plaintiffs' preliminary injunction motion. 8/30/19: Parties to file joint status report, Plaintiffs to file reply in support of preliminary injunction motion, and Defendant to file reply in support of motion to dismiss.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Status Conference, Briefing Deadlines and Hearing Date for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Xavier Becerra. (Wise, R.) Modified on 6/25/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #10 ). The motion is noticed for hearing on 7/26/2019, which is not an available law and motion date. Accordingly, the hearing on the motion is RESET for 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM. Filing deadlines are reset as provided by Local Rule 230. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 8/15/2019 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. Both hearings will be held in in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS by Xavier Becerra. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Wise, R.)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Xavier Becerra. Attorney Wise, R. Matthew added. (Wise, R.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra served on 4/18/2019. (Bellantoni, Amy) Modified on 5/3/2019 (Washington, S).
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo re #4 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Bellantoni, Amy)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 [DISREGARD TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY] SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Bellantoni, Amy) Modified on 5/2/2019 (Washington, S).
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/29/19. Added attorney Amy L. Bellantoni, PHV for Mark Baird and Richard Gallardo. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 8/15/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christopher Richard Cosca* *Attorney at Law* *1007 7th Street, Suite 210* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 9, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8204185. (Cosca, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 PAYMENT for #2 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8203995. (Cosca, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo for attorney Amy L. Bellantoni to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Cosca, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Xavier Becerra by Mark Baird, Richard Gallardo. Attorney Cosca, Christopher Richard added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cosca, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baird et al v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Baird
Represented By: Christopher Richard Cosca
Represented By: Amy L. Bellantoni, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gallardo
Represented By: Christopher Richard Cosca
Represented By: Amy L. Bellantoni, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?