(HC) Ferris v. Foss

Petitioner: David Ferris
Respondent: T. Foss
Case Number: 2:2019cv00626
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and ifp form served on David Ferris. (Yin, K)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/17/2019 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, a complete application to proceed ifp, or pay the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner a new ifp form. (Yin, K)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by David Ferris (Coll, A)
April 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and ifp form served on David Ferris. (Yin, K)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/25/2019 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, a complete application to proceed ifp, with the required certification, or pay the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner a new ifp form. (Yin, K)
April 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on David Ferris. (Becknal, R)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Becknal, R)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by David Ferris. (Becknal, R)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against T. Foss by David Ferris.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Ferris v. Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?