Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Whirlow Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Thelonious Music Corp., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Hot-Cha Music Co., Embassy Music Corporation, Spirit One Music, Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., Conducive Music, Springtime Music, Inc. and Unichappell Music Inc.
Defendant: Whirlow Company, Inc., Michael Edward Whirlow and Lisa Gaye Whirlow
Case Number: 2:2019cv00642
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs. (Frank, Karen)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Plaintiffs. Attorney Dave, Foram added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Michael Whirlow, #2 Proof of Service Lisa Whirlow)(Dave, Foram) Modified on 5/22/2019 (York, M).
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants Served on: 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lisa Whirlow Served on: 4/25/2019, #2 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Michael Whirlow Served on: 4/25/2019)(Frank, Karen) Modified on 5/8/2019 (Washington, S).
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 COPYRIGHT REPORT NUMBER 2 as to Copyright #6:* PA 118-156 * * We're In This Love Together * * Roger Murrah; Keith Stegall * ; (Washington, S)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* PA 5-715 * * Boogie Oogie Oogie * * Janice Marie Johnson; Perry Kibble * Copyright #2:* Ep 244288 RE 742-859 * * Chain Of Fools * * Don Covay * Copyright #3:* PA 115-197 * * I Can't Go For That (No Can Do) * * Daryl Hall; John Oates; Sara Allen * Copyright #4:* RE 627-422 Eu 873659 * * Mustang Sally * * Bonny Rice * Copyright #5:* RE 317-920 Eu 516957 * * Rhythm A Ning a/k/a Rhythm-A-Ning * * Thelonious Monk *; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 Order re Filing Requirements, #4 VDRP) (Washington, S)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lisa Gaye Whirlow, Michael Edward Whirlow, Whirlow Company, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Karen S. Frank* *Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass* *One Montgomery Street Suite 3000* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Washington, S)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Whirlow Company, Inc., Lisa Gaye Whirlow, Michael Edward Whirlow by all Plaintiffs. Attorney Frank, Karen S. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8213819) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Schedule 7.1)(Frank, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Whirlow Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PWMP Acquisition I LLC
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelonious Music Corp.
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA LLC
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hot-Cha Music Co.
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Embassy Music Corporation
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit One Music
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music, Inc.
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourteenth Hour Music Inc.
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conducive Music
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springtime Music, Inc.
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Karen S. Frank
Represented By: Foram Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlow Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Edward Whirlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Gaye Whirlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?