(PC) Cardenas v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Danny J. Cardenas and Danny Cardenas, Jr.
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2019cv00691
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order served on Danny Cardenas Jr. (Henshaw, R)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/24/2019 ORDERING Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on Director of CDCR pursuant to #12 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
May 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Danny J. Cardenas. (Yin, K)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Danny J. Cardenas signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/24/2019. Plaintiff's #8 motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with this order. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Danny J. Cardenas. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT by Danny J. Cardenas re #1 Civil Rights Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Danny J. Cardenas. (Washington, S)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Danny J. Cardenas. (Washington, S) Modified on 5/8/2019 (Plummer, M).
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Danny J. Cardenas. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Danny J. Cardenas. (Lundstrom, T)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lundstrom, T)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-02043.
April 24, 2019 case electronically transmitted to the Eastern District of California. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019) [Transferred from cand on 4/24/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019) [Transferred from cand on 4/24/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 4/24/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 5/24/2019. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 4/24/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1983) (no process), (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 4/16/2019). Filed by Danny J. Cardenas. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 4/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Cardenas v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny J. Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Cardenas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?