(PS) Lam, et al v Penny Mac, et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Ring and Monica K. Lam
Defendant: Fidelity National Title, Mass Mutual Life Insurance, Penny Mac, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Wedgewood Inc., Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, Auction.com Inc. and Nations Direct Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00709
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to DISMISS by Fidelity National Title. Attorney Johnson, Josette D. added. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca Erickson, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Johnson, Josette)
June 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #26 Order served on Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring. (York, M)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/19/2019 GRANTING #9 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 7/24/2019 hearing on defendants' #21 Motion to Dismiss is VACATED. Defendants shall re-file and re-notice their motion, if necessary, after plaintiffs file their first amended complaint. (York, M)
June 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 25 Minute Order served on Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring. (Streeter, J)
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/18/25019: Defendants' #24 Request to Appear Telephonically at the 7/24/2019 Motion to Dismiss hearing is GRANTED. Counsel is instructed to use the following to connect to the call: 877-848-7030 (phone), 7431521 (access code). (Streeter, J)
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 7/24/2019 Motion hearing re #21 Motion to Dismiss by Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, Wedgewood Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yang, Elaine) Modified on 6/20/2019 (Benson, A.).
June 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 23 Minute Order served on Monica K. Lam and Douglas Ring. (Streeter, J)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/14/2019: On the Court's own motion the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #21 ) scheduled for 7/24/2019 at 10:00 AM is RESET for 7/24/2019 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Streeter, J)
June 14, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, Wedgewood Inc. in re #21 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Yang, Elaine)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to DISMISS by Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, Wedgewood Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yang, Elaine)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, Wedgewood Inc. in re #18 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Yang, Elaine)
June 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 19 Minute Order served on Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring. (Krueger, M)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/14/2019: Pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(21), Defendant Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLCs Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #18 ) shall be noticed before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Counsel for Defendant shall contact the Clerk for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for available law and motion dates, and re-notice the motion before the Magistrate Judge with the proper time and date. Accordingly, the 7/25/2019 hearing before District Judge Troy L. Nunley is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to DISMISS by Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, Wedgewood Inc.. Attorney Yang, Elaine added. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yang, Elaine) Modified on 6/14/2019 (Streeter, J).
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Monica K. Lam. (Coll, A)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Monica K. Lam. (Coll, A)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Monica K. Lam. (Coll, A)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Monica K. Lam. (Coll, A)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Monica K. Lam. (Coll, A)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Monica K. Lam. (Coll, A)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Monica K. Lam. (Coll, A)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Monica K. Lam. (Coll, A)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to AMEND the #1 Complaint by Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring. (Huang, H)
May 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL [HAND DELIVER]: #8 Summons served on Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring. (Reader, L)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Auction.com Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring* *911 Lakeville Street* *#347* *Petluma, California 94952*. (Reader, L)
May 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL [HAND DELIVER]: #7 Summons served on Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring. (Reader, L)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Nations Direct Mortgage, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring* *911 Lakeville Street* *#347* *Petaluma, California 94952*. (Reader, L)
May 21, 2019 SERVICE AT COUNTER: #5 Summons, CAED Receipt and #6 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Monica K. Lam and Douglas Ring. (Benson, A.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Benson, A.)
May 21, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE200098326 $400.00 fbo Monica K. Lam by Monia K. Lam on 5/21/2019. (Benson, A.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, Fidelity National Title, Penny Mac, Mass Mutual Life Insurance, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Wedgewood Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring* *911 Lakeville Street # 347* *Petaluma, CA 94952*. (Benson, A.)
May 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring. (Reader, L)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/8/2019 GRANTING plaintiffs fourteen days in which to submit the appropriate fee to the Clerk of the Court. Plaintiffs are cautioned that failure to pay the filing and general administrative fees in the amount of $400 will result in a recommendation that the applications to proceed in forma pauperis be denied and the instant action be dismissed without prejudice. (Reader, L)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Douglas Ring. (Kaminski, H)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Monica K. Lam. (Kaminski, H)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Monica K. Lam, Douglas Ring. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Lam, et al v Penny Mac, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title
Represented By: Josette D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mass Mutual Life Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Mac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wedgewood Inc.
Represented By: Elaine Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016
Represented By: Elaine Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auction.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nations Direct Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica K. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?