(PS) Heuvel v. Placerville Self Storage
Plaintiff: Jean Marc Van den Heuvel
Defendant: Placerville Self Storage
Case Number: 2:2019cv00713
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Minute Order served on Jean Marc Van den Heuvel. (Waldrop, A)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/12/2019: The Court is in receipt of plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #7 ). However, pursuant to the Order and Findings and Recommendations issued June 6 (ECF No. #6 ), Plaintiff's complaint is subject to dismissal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and all motion practice is currently stayed pending review by the assigned district judge. At this time, the only document Plaintiff may file in this case are objections to the F & R (See ECF No. #6 ). Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is STRICKEN from the record. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jean Marc Van den Heuvel. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 6, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and Findings and Recommendations, served on Jean Marc Van den Heuvel. (Reader, L)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/6/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and the Clerk of Court be directed to close this case. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that all pleading, discovery and motion practice in this action are STAYED pending resolution of the F & R's. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 LODGED judgment in a civil action by Jean Marc Van den Heuvel (Reader, L)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Placerville Self Storage served on 5/10/2019. (Reader, L)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE re SUBPOENA by Jean Marc Van den Heuvel. (Huang, H)
April 26, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Coll, A)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jean Marc Van den Heuvel. (Coll, A)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Placerville Self Storage by Jean Marc Van den Heuvel.(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Heuvel v. Placerville Self Storage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placerville Self Storage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Marc Van den Heuvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?