Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. National Express Transit Services Corp.
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Defendant: National Express Transit Services Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00744
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *National Express Transit Services Corporation* (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Christopher O. Hammer re #6 Request for Entry of Default. (Hammer, Christopher)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to National Express Transit Services Corporation by Northwest Administrators, Inc.. (Hammer, Christopher)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: National Express Transit Services Corporation served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Hammer, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Catherine E. Holzhauser on behalf of Northwest Administrators, Inc. Attorney Holzhauser, Catherine E. added. (Holzhauser, Catherine)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *National Express Transit Services Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christopher Oscar Hammer* *Beeson, Tayer & Bodine* *520 Capitol Mall, Ste. 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Benson, A.)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Express Transit Services Corporation by Northwest Administrators, Inc. Attorney Hammer, Christopher Oscar added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8237575) (Attachment #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hammer, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. National Express Transit Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Oscar Hammer
Represented By: Catherine E. Holzhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Express Transit Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?