(PS)Johnson v. Vigen
Plaintiff: Todd Ladon Johnson
Defendant: Lauren Vigen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00769
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order, served on Todd Ladon Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/2/19 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED, but with leave to amend. Within 28 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint in accordance with this order. Alternatively, if Plaintiff no longer wishes to pursue this action in federal court, plaintiff shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal of the action without prejudice within 28 days of the date of this order. Failure to file either a first amended complaint or a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice by the required deadline may result in dismissal of the action with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 7, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Todd Ladon Johnson. (Plummer, M)
May 7, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Plummer, M)
May 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Todd Ladon Johnson. (Plummer, M)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) This case has been re-designated as a pro se action. The new case document #3 filed on 5/03/19 shall be disregard. This case has been assigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-769 KJM KJN (PS). (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/7/2019 (Plummer, M).
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to 5/06/19 clerk's notice, this case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-769 KJN (PC). (Plummer, M)
May 6, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction served on Todd Ladon Johnson. (Plummer, M)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION (TEXT ONLY): This prisoner case was assigned a District Judge due to clerical error and should be disregarded. The correct case number is 2:19-cv-0769 KJN (PC). (Plummer, M)
May 6, 2019 [DISREGARD-ENTERED DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR]SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction served on Todd Ladon Johnson. (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/6/2019 (Plummer, M).
May 6, 2019 [DISREGARD-ENTERED DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR]APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/6/2019 (Plummer, M).
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 [DISREGARD-ENTERED DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR]CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION (TEXT ONLY): Prisoner new case documents were issued regarding this pro se action due to clerical error and should be disregarded. (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/6/2019 (Plummer, M). Modified on 5/6/2019 (Plummer, M).
May 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for DJ Presider served on Todd Ladon Johnson. (Reader, L)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 [DISREGARD PURSUANT TO 5/07/19 CLERK'S NOTICE]PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Reader, L) Modified on 5/6/2019 (Plummer, M). Modified on 5/6/2019 (Plummer, M). Modified on 5/7/2019 (Plummer, M).
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Todd Ladon Johnson. (Reader, L)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Lauren Vigen by Todd Ladon Johnson.(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS)Johnson v. Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Ladon Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?