(PC) Belyew v. Garafalo et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Defendant: Leber, Elliot, Garafalo, Herrera, Cotter, Bretton, King and Solaria
Case Number: 2:2019cv00803
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #8 by Plaintiff Lisa Belyew. (Kaminski, H)
May 9, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order, Findings and Recommendations served on Lisa Belyew. (Yin, K)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/8/2019 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action and RECOMMENDING plaintiff be ordered to pay the entire $400.00 in required fees within 30 days or face dismissal of the case. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Lisa Belyew. (Zignago, K.)
May 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and #4 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Lisa Belyew. (Henshaw, R)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Lisa Belyew, CDC WG-0016 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENTS SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Transfer Order, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Central California Women's Facility. (Jessen, A)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/3/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Jessen, A)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO SACRAMENTO DIVISION signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/7/2019. New Case Number 2:19-cv-00803-AC (PC). Old Case Number 1:19-cv-00591-GSA (PC). (Jessen, A)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lisa Belyew. (Jessen, A)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Bretton, Cotter, Elliot, Garafalo, Herrera, King, Leber, Solaria by Lisa Belyew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Belyew v. Garafalo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garafalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bretton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?