(HC) Tomlinson v. Diaz et al

Petitioner: Jared Tomlinson
Respondent: Ralph M. Diaz and People of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2019cv00817
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-0817 JAM EFB (HC). (Plummer, M)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ralph M. Diaz. Attorney Powell, John Wesley added. (Powell, John)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/16/2019. Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2019. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/15/2019 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days of the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Becknal, R)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Ralph M. Diaz, People of the State of California by Jared Tomlinson. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0972-8253002) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarthy, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Tomlinson v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jared Tomlinson
Represented By: Paul G. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph M. Diaz
Represented By: John Wesley Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?