Hewlett v. MNet Financial, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kinaya Hewlett
Defendant: MNet Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00864
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER by MNet Financial, Inc.. Attorney Valenti, Anthony Paul John added.(Valenti, Anthony)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against MNet Financial, Inc. by Kinaya Hewlett.(Fisher, Lawrence)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: MNet Financial, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Fisher, Lawrence)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by MNet Financial, Inc.. Attorney Ellis, Mark E. added.(Ellis, Mark)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *MNet Financial, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lawrence Timothy Fisher* *Bursor and Fisher, PA* *1990 N. California Blvd. Suite 940* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MNet Financial, Inc. by Kinaya Hewlett. Attorney Fisher, Lawrence Timothy added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8262014) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewlett v. MNet Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNet Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Ellis
Represented By: Anthony Paul John Valenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinaya Hewlett
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?