(PC) Gerard Gutierrez v. Tucker
Plaintiff: Gerardo Gutierrez
Defendant: V. Tucker
Case Number: 2:2019cv00878
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT Consent or Decline due by 8/5/2019 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 07/01/19. (Plummer, M)
July 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order Directing Service by USM and local rules served on Gerardo Gutierrez. 2 summons, 1 USM-285 form, 2 copies of the complaint, 2 consent forms and 2 copies of this order to the U.S. Marshal. (Plummer, M)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/28/19 DIRECTING USM to serve * complaint * filed on * 5/07/19,* on * V. Tucker*. (Plummer, M)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Forms, and 2 copies of the complaint by Gerardo Gutierrez. (Coll, A)
June 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order, 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Form with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 5/7/2019 served on Gerardo Gutierrez. (Henshaw, R)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/11/2019 DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms with Notice of Submission of Documents within 30 days of the date of service of this order. Service is appropriate for V. Tucker. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Form with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 5/7/2019. (Henshaw, R)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #3 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
May 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment,, served on Gerardo Gutierrez. (Plummer, M)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 05/29/19 GRANTING #3 motion to proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Gerardo Gutierrez. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial) (Plummer, M)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gerardo Gutierrez. (Kastilahn, A)
May 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gerardo Gutierrez. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-02469.
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Transfer. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate all pending motions and transfer the file to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/14/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)[Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.] (Henshaw, R).
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/14/2019. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.] (Henshaw, R).
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerardo Gutierrez. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gerardo Gutierrez. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against V. Tucker. Filed byGerardo Gutierrez. Consent/Declination due by 6/6/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/16/2019.] (Henshaw, R).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Gerard Gutierrez v. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?