(PC) Prince v. San Joaquin County Sheriff et al

Plaintiff: Ivin Capone Prince
Defendant: Blake, Kendrick, Phillips and San Joaquin County Sheriff
Case Number: 2:2019cv00887
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order served on Ivin Capone Prince. (Henshaw, R)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/9/2019 DENYING #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
July 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order and IFP application served on Ivin Capone Prince. (Henshaw, R)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/8/2019 ORDERING Plaintiff to complete his part of the IFP application and ask the appropriate jail official to fill out and certify its part within 30 days of the date of this order and ORDERING San Joaquin County Jail official to submit a certified copy of the jail trust fund account statement for inmate Ivan Capone Prince within 72 business hours of this notification. (Henshaw, R)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Ivin Capone Prince. (Kastilahn, A)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Ivin Capone Prince. (Coll, A)
June 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice served on Ivin Capone Prince. (Becknal, R)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): This case is assigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; the new case number is 2:19-cv-00887-KJM-AC (PC). (Becknal, R)
June 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Ivin Capone Prince. (Henshaw, R)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/17/2019 DENYING #6 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted 30 days from the date of this Order within which to file an IFP application and provide the certified copy of his jail trust account, per #4 Order. (Henshaw, R)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for the appointment of counsel and an extension of time to work on this action by Ivin Capone Prince. (Becknal, R) Modified on 6/14/2019 (Plummer, M).
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ivin Capone Prince. (Becknal, R)
May 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, and prisoner IFP form served on Ivin Capone Prince. (Plummer, M)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/22/19 DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to Proceed In Forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his jail trust account statement for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Plummer, M)
May 20, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider re-served on Ivin Capone Prince at San Joaquin County Jail. (Yin, K)
May 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ivin Capone Prince. (Kastilahn, A)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kastilahn, A)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ivin Capone Prince. (Kastilahn, A)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Ivin Capone Prince.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Prince v. San Joaquin County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivin Capone Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?