(PS) Barroga v. Board of Administration, Cal Public Employees' Retirement System
Plaintiff: Lucio A. Barroga
Defendant: Board of Administration, Cal Public Employees' Reitrement System and Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System
Case Number: 2:2019cv00921
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
2 Judge: Kendall J Newman
3 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 18 Clerk's Decline of Entry of Default served on Lucio A. Barroga. (York, M)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT DECLINED as to Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System. The clerk hereby declines to enter #17 Request for Entry of Default filed by Lucio A. Barroga for the following reason: Defendant was granted an extension of time until 7/22/2019, to file a response. (TEXT ONLY) (York, M)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System by Lucio A. Barroga. (York, M)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE re #12 Request: Without Signature is Invalid by Plaintiff Lucio A. Barroga. (York, M)
June 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 15 Clerk's Decline of Entry of Default served on Lucio A. Barroga. (Coll, A)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT DECLINED as to Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System. The clerk hereby declines to enter #14 Request for Entry of Default filed by Lucio A. Barroga due to Request for #12 Extension of Time filed and Approved by 13 Minute Order on 6/21/19. (TEXT ONLY) (Coll, A)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System by Lucio A. Barroga. (Coll, A)
June 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 13 Minute Order served on Lucio A. Barroga. (Waldrop, A)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/21/2019: Defendant's request for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. #12 ) is APPROVED. Defendant shall have until July 22, 2019 to file a response. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System. Attorney Ray, Brenda Ann added. (Ray, Brenda) Modified on 6/27/2019 (Coll, A).
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re Orders by Lucio A. Barroga. (Coll, A)
June 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Civil New Case Documents for MCE served on Lucio A. Barroga. (Coll, A)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Coll, A)
June 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Reassigning Case served on Lucio A. Barroga. (Coll, A)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/11/19 REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. District Judge Troy L. Nunley, Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:19-cv-0921-MCE-KJN (PS). (Coll, A)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re date by Lucio A. Barroga. (Becknal, R)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF of SERVICE of Docket and NEF by Lucio A. Barroga. (York, M)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE via US Mail by Lucio A. Barroga to Matthew G. Jacobs, General Counsel and Legal Department, Board of Administration, Cal Public Employees' Retirement System re #2 Summons, #3 Civil New Documents, and #5 Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (York, M)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Lucio A. Barroga. (Becknal, R)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Board of Administration, Cal Public Employees' Retirement System served on 5/22/2019. (Huang, H) Modifie
May 22, 2019 SERVICE AT COUNTER: CAED Receipt, #2 Summons and #3 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Lucio A. Barroga. (Benson, A.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Benson, A.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Board of Administration, Cal Public Employees' Reitrement System* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lucio A. Barroga* *PO Box 2516* *Long Beach, CA 90801*. (Benson, A.)
May 22, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE200098334 $400.00 fbo Lucio A. Barroga by Lucio A. Barroga on 5/22/2019. (Benson, A.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Administration, Cal Public Employees' Retirement System by Lucio A. Barroga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Barroga v. Board of Administration, Cal Public Employees' Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucio A. Barroga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Administration, Cal Public Employees' Reitrement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Brenda Ann Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?