Roberts v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Megan Roberts
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01035
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Megan Roberts. (Asbill, Natalia)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Megan Roberts. (Asbill, Natalia)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Megan Roberts. (Asbill, Natalia)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation re #2 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Stoecklein, Jennifer)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation. (Stoecklein, Jennifer)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Huang, H)
June 6, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE200098629 $400.00 fbo CDCR by State of California on 6/6/2019. (Zignago, K.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00255277 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stoecklein, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Roberts
Represented By: Natalia D. Asbill
Represented By: Natalia D. Asbill-Bearor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Represented By: Jennifer Stoecklein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?