(PS) Sharma v. SITOA Board Members, et al.
Plaintiff: Bikram Sharma
Defendant: SITOA Board Members, Mohammad Hawarneh, Mushtaq A. King, Asif Mehmood, Farhad Muhaiudin and Zahid Khan
Case Number: 2:2019cv01070
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Minute Order served on Bikram Sharma. (Cannarozzi, N)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: On 7/12/2019 the Pltf filed a document styled as a motion for change of venue #6 , which the Court construes as a motion for remand. The Pltf also failed to properly notice his motion for hearing pursuant to Local Rule 230. On the Court's own motion, Pltf's Motion for Remand #6 is ordered SET for hearing on 8/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Defts' response to the motion for remand shall be due on or before 8/14/2019. Pltf's reply, if any, shall be filed by 8/21/2019. Additionally, the 7/24/2019 hearing re: Defts' Motion to Dismiss #4 is ordered CONTINUED to 8/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/22/2019. (Text only entry)(Cannarozzi, N)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY by Mohammad Hawarneh, Zahid Khan, et al., re #4 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A )(Kuykendall, Dale) Modified on 7/18/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to CHANGE VENUE by Bikram Sharma. (Mena-Sanchez, L) ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Bikram Sharma. (Becknal, R)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by Mohammad Hawarneh et al. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Kuykendall, Dale) Modified on 6/19/2019 (Coll, A).
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Mohammad Hawarneh, Zahid Khan, Mushtaq A. King, Asif Mehmood, Farhad Muhaiudin, SITOA Board Members re #2 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Kuykendall, Dale)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00253854 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8307715) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Kuykendall, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Sharma v. SITOA Board Members, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SITOA Board Members
Represented By: Dale R. Kuykendall
Represented By: Sierra W. Vierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Hawarneh
Represented By: Dale R. Kuykendall
Represented By: Sierra W. Vierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mushtaq A. King
Represented By: Dale R. Kuykendall
Represented By: Sierra W. Vierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asif Mehmood
Represented By: Dale R. Kuykendall
Represented By: Sierra W. Vierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farhad Muhaiudin
Represented By: Dale R. Kuykendall
Represented By: Sierra W. Vierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zahid Khan
Represented By: Dale R. Kuykendall
Represented By: Sierra W. Vierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bikram Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?