Navarrette v. LoanCare, LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel Navarrette
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01071
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Plaintiff's Proposed Attorney Substitution (ECF No. #8 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, Attorney Brian Davalos is substituted as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Daniel Navarrette, in place of Attorney Russell A. Wyatt. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Daniel Navarrette. (Wyatt, Russell)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/22/19 ORDERING that LoanCare's deadline to respond to the Complaint shall be extended an additional twenty-eight (28) days, from July 18, 2019 to August 15, 2019. (Kaminski, H)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by LoanCare, LLC. (Thomley, Brian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint By Not More Than 28 Days by LoanCare, LLC. (Thomley, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by LoanCare, LLC re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal. (Thomley, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by LoanCare, LLC. (Thomley, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00257147 by LoanCare, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8307981) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Thomley, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarrette v. LoanCare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Navarrette
Represented By: Russell A. Wyatt
Represented By: Brian Davalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC
Represented By: Brian Scott Thomley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?