(PC) Rodriguez v. Albonico et al
Plaintiff: David Arnold Rodriguez
Defendant: D. Cox, J. Jackson, K. Loftin, N. Albonico and Craddock
Case Number: 2:2019cv01108
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST FOR STATUS by David Arnold Rodriguez. (Becknal, R) (Response sent: "Your requested conformed copies are enclosed.") Modified on 8/14/2019 (Henshaw, R).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST for verification of documents submitted to the Court by David Arnold Rodriguez. (Mena-Sanchez, L)(Response sent: "Plaintiff's first amended complaint, in forma pauperis application, motion to appoint counsel and declaration were all filed on July 22, 2019. Plaintiff's request for new case documents was filed on July 24, 2019. ") Modified on 8/7/2019 (Plummer, M).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST to verify whether his recent filings were received by David Arnold Rodriguez. (Kastilahn, A)(Response sent: "Plaintiff's first amended complaint, in forma pauperis application, motion to appoint counsel and declaration were all filed on July 22, 2019. Plaintiff's request for new case documents was filed on July 24, 2019. See above about obtaining copies of documents.") Modified on 8/5/2019 (Plummer, M).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST for a copy of the initial new case documents by David Arnold Rodriguez. (Kastilahn, A) (Response - one-time only courtesy copy of new case documents sent with copy procedures.) Modified on 7/26/2019 (Yin, K).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by David Arnold Rodriguez. (Kastilahn, A)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David Arnold Rodriguez. (Kastilahn, A)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by David Arnold Rodriguez.(Kastilahn, A)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-1108 MCE AC (PC). (Kastilahn, A)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on David Arnold Rodriguez. (Kastilahn, A)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by David Arnold Rodriguez re stolen mail. (Kastilahn, A)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by David Arnold Rodriguez. (Kastilahn, A)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by David Arnold Rodriguez. (Coll, A)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for David Arnold Rodriguez, CDC AF-0134 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Becknal, R)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on David Arnold Rodriguez. (Becknal, R)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David Arnold Rodriguez. (Becknal, R)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by David Arnold Rodriguez.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Rodriguez v. Albonico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Loftin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Albonico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Arnold Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?