Lasquade v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Lasquade
Defendant: WebBank, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., USAA Federal Savings Bank, Comenity Bank, Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion, LLC, TD Bank USA, N.A. and Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv01132
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant WebBank. (Jaeger, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER by WebBank.(Jaeger, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ohlendorf, Renee)
August 13, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT (with Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC) by Deborah Lasquade. Dispositional Docs due by 9/6/2019. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 8/15/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 8, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Synchrony Bank. (Kassabian, Raffi)
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER by Synchrony Bank.(Kassabian, Raffi)
July 30, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER by Comenity Bank.(Yazdi, Jennifer)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/24/2019 DISMISSING with prejudice Experian Information Solutions, Inc. pursuant to #25 Stipulation. The case to proceed on Plaintiff's remaining claims. (Henshaw, R)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/22/2019 ORDERING attorney Katherine Carlton Robinson, PHV added for TransUnion, LLC. (Zignago, K.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for (Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) by Deborah Lasquade. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Angelo, Joseph)
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Synchrony Bank to Respond to Complaint for Less than 28 Days by Synchrony Bank. Attorney Kassabian, Raffi L. added. (Kassabian, Raffi) Modified on 7/26/2019 (Becknal, R).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/18/19 EXTENDING time for Defendant TD Bank USA, N.A., to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 8/13/19. (Becknal, R)
July 17, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Quinn, Thomas Patrick added. (Quinn, Thomas) Modified on 7/18/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER by TransUnion, LLC.(Booth, Eileen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Booth, Eileen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by TransUnion, LLC for attorney Katherine Carlton Robinson to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Booth, Eileen T. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8358821) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Booth, Eileen)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Synchrony Bank served on 6/25/2019. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 6/25/2019. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint By Not More Than 28 Days by WebBank. Attorney Jaeger, Michael added. (Jaeger, Michael) Modified on 8/8/2019 (Huang, H).
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Comenity Bank to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Comenity Bank. (Yazdi, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant WebBank. (Jaeger, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Ohlendorf, Renee)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Comenity Bank. (Yazdi, Jennifer)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lawdan Yazdi on behalf of Comenity Bank. Attorney Yazdi, Jennifer Lawdan added. (Yazdi, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by TD Bank USA, N.A.. Attorney Ohlendorf, Renee Choy added. (Ohlendorf, Renee) Modified on 7/11/2019 (Becknal, R).
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: WebBank served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Angelo, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: TransUnion, LLC served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Angelo, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Angelo, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Citibank, N.A. served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Angelo, Joseph)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: TD Bank USA, N.A. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Angelo, Joseph)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Comenity Bank served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Angelo, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Citibank, N.A., Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Synchrony Bank, TD Bank USA, N.A., TransUnion, LLC, USAA Federal Savings Bank, WebBank* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph Angelo* *Gale Angelo Johnson & Pruett, P.C.* *1430 Blue Oaks Blvd., Ste. 250* *Roseville, CA 95747*. (Benson, A.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants by Deborah Lasquade. Attorney Angelo, Joseph added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8322538) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Angelo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasquade v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank
Represented By: Michael Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Represented By: Jennifer Lawdan Yazdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Carlton Robinson, PHV
Represented By: Eileen T. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Renee Choy Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Raffi L. Kassabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lasquade
Represented By: Joseph Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?