(PS) Harris v. Placer County Jail
Plaintiff: Ryan A. Harris
Defendant: Placer County Jail
Case Number: 2:2019cv01139
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Ryan A. Harris. (Yin, K)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/2/2019 DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with leave to file a first amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
August 2, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Ryan A. Harris. (Reader, L)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/1/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Reader, L)
June 25, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Plummer, M)
June 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Ryan A. Harris. (Plummer, M)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): This case was designated as a prisoner case due to clerical error and is re-classified as a pro se action. The prisoner new case documents #3 shall be disregarded. This case has been assigned to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-1139 MCE DMC (PS). (Plummer, M)
June 21, 2019 SERVICE AT COUNTER: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ryan A. Harris. (Benson, A.) Modified on 6/21/2019 (Benson, A.).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 [DISREGARD-ENTERED DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR]PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Benson, A.) Modified on 6/25/2019 (Plummer, M).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ryan A. Harris. (Benson, A.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Placer County Jail by Ryan A. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.) Modified on 6/25/2019 (Plummer, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Harris v. Placer County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan A. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?