Arroyo v. Mehrabi, et al.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01147
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/8/2020 CONTINUING the Scheduling Conference to 9/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The joint status report shall be filed by 9/8/2020. (Coll, A)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER 25 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/14/2020 continuing the Scheduling Conference to 5/11/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The joint status report shall be filed no later than 4/27/2020. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/8/19 ORDERING that within 14 days of this Order, the parties shall contact the court's VDRP administrator, Sujean Park, to start the process of selecting an appropriate neutral. This action i s STAYED to provide the parties time to complete the VDRP session. No later than five (5) days after completion of the VDRP session, the parties shall file a joint statement indicating whether a settlement was reached. The parties shall complete t he VDRP session no later than 12/13/2019. The court RESETS the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference for 1/21/2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. If a settlement is not reached through VDRP, the parties shall submit an Amended Joint Status Report no later than 1/7/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Transferring Venue to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/21/2019. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arroyo v. Mehrabi, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?