(PC) Morgan v. Sacramento County Sheriffs Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Sammy Davis Morgan
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriffs Dept., Morgan, Sacramento County Main Jail and Croteau
Case Number: 2:2019cv01179
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST to amend the civil cover sheet by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 8/21/2019 (Plummer, M).
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 SECOND AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sammy Davis Morgan.(Kastilahn, A)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST for RULES and FORMS by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Benson, A.)(Response sent: "The Eastern District of California Local Rules are available on the court website at www.caed.uscourts.gov.") Modified on 8/19/2019 (Plummer, M).
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for DISCOVERY by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Huang, H)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for HEARING by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Huang, H)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sammy Davis Morgan.(Huang, H)
July 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: [ 10 ] Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Sammy Davis Morgan. (Reader, L)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:19-CV-1179 KJM DMC. (Reader, L)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for discovery by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Reader, L)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for private investigator by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Reader, L)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Sacramento County Main Jail, Deputy Morgan #847, Sergeant Croteau #847 by Sammy Davis Morgan.(Reader, L)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Reader, L)
July 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Sammy Davis Morgan. (York, M)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/28/2019 ORDERING that plaintiff may file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (York, M)
June 28, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Sammy Davis Morgan. Copy of #4 Order and #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on Sacramento County Mail Jail, Attn: Inmate Trust Accounts651 I Street, Sacramento, California 95814. (Henshaw, R)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/27/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Sammy Davis Morgan. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
June 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sammy Davis Morgan. (Kastilahn, A)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kastilahn, A)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 6/27/2019 (Plummer, M).
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Morgan, Sacramento County Sheriffs Dept., by Sammy Davis Morgan.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Morgan v. Sacramento County Sheriffs Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriffs Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Main Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Croteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammy Davis Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?