California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. City of Colusa
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Defendant: City of Colusa
Case Number: 2:2019cv01252
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/25/2019: Pursuant to the Stipulation and Order setting Settlement Conference on 10/23/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Newman (ECF No. #9 ), the parties are instructed to have a principal with full settlement authority present for the settlement conference or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms. The individual with full settlement authority to settle must also have unfettered discretion and authority to change the settlement position of the party, if appropriate. The purpose behind requiring attendance of a person with full settlement authority is that the parties view of the case may be altered during the face to face conference. An authorization to settle for a limited dollar amount or sum certain can be found not to comply with the requirement of full authority to settle. The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement conference statements seven days prior to the settlement conference. These statements shall be simultaneously delivered to the Court using the following email address: kjnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. These statements should not be filed on the case docket. If a party desires to share additional confidential information with the Court, they may do so pursuant to the provisions of Local Rule 270(d) and (e). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/28/19 ORDERING that Settlement Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Kaminski, H)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for A Settlement Conference With Magistrate Newman on 10/23/19 by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance. (Packard, Andrew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff California Sportfishing Protection Alliance. (Carlon, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by City of Colusa. Attorney Jones, Ryan R. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jones, Ryan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: City of Colusa served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Carlon, William)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Colusa* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William N. Carlson* *245 Kentucky St* *Suite B3* *Petaluma, CA 94952*. (Coll, A)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 [DISREGARD - ISSUED IN ERROR] SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Sportfishing Protection Alliance* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *WILLIAM N. CARLON* *245 Kentucky St* *Suite B3* *Petaluma, CA 94952*. (Coll, A) Modified on 7/8/2019 (Coll, A).
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Colusa by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8344217) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carlon, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. City of Colusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Colusa
Represented By: Ryan R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Represented By: Andrew L. Packard
Represented By: William Nazar Carlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?