(HC) Strong v. Foss
Petitioner: Christopher Strong
Respondent: Tammy Foss
Case Number: 2:2019cv01268
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-1268 KJM GGH (HC). (Plummer, M)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tammy Foss. Attorney Doering, Erin Rebecca added. (Doering, Erin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Petition served on Tami Krenzin pursuant to #3 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition. (Yin, K)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/19/2019. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Yin, K)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/19/2019 DIRECTING respondent to file a response to the petition within 60 days. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order, a copy of the petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Yin, K)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Zignago, K.)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Tammy Foss by Christopher Strong. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0972-8344259) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giffard, Kenny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Strong v. Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Strong
Represented By: Kenny Norman Giffard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tammy Foss
Represented By: Erin Rebecca Doering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?