Earth Island Institute et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Forest Service and Margie B. DeRose
Case Number: 2:2019cv01271
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Taylor Ferrell on behalf of Margie B. DeRose, United States Forest Service. Attorney Ferrell, Taylor added. (Ferrell, Taylor)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/18/2019 GRANTING #6 Application as to Attorney Morgan Staric, PHV to represent Center for Biological Diversity and Earth Island Institute. (York, M)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Buchele, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Earth Island Institute. (Buchele, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Center for Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute for attorney Morgan Staric to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8353666) (Attachments: #1 Staric Certificate of Good Standing)(Buchele, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Margie B. DeRose, United States Forest Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Thomas Buchele* *Lewis & Clark Law School* *10015 SW Terwilliger Blvd.* *Portland, Oregon 97219-7799*. (Reader, L)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Margie B. DeRose, United States Forest Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Thomas Buchele* *10015 SW Terwilliger Blvd.e* *Portland OR 97219*. (Coll, A)
July 9, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8348830. (Buchele, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Center for Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute (Buchele, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Earth Island Institute, Center for Biological Diversity. Attorney Buchele, Thomas C. added. (Buchele, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earth Island Institute et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Taylor Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margie B. DeRose
Represented By: Taylor Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute
Represented By: Thomas C. Buchele
Represented By: Morgan Staric, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Thomas C. Buchele
Represented By: Morgan Staric, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?