(PC) Vasquez v. Moghaddam et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Vasquez
Defendant: David Baughman, Jian Ma, Eilya Moghaddam and Manjula Bobbla
Case Number: 2:2019cv01283
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Andrew Vasquez. (Kastilahn, A)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Andrew Vasquez. (Huang, H)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Andrew Vasquez, CDC AP5438 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/10/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 8/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kaminski, H)
July 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL and EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Andrew Vasquez. (Kaminski, H)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Andrew Vasquez. (Kaminski, H)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Andrew Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Vasquez v. Moghaddam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eilya Moghaddam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manjula Bobbla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?