(PC) Bland v. Kernan et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Davis Bland and Joshua-Davis Bland
Defendant: California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation and Scott Kernan
Case Number: 2:2019cv01315
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Joshua Davis Bland. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 9, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Joshua Davis Bland to updated address. (Plummer, M)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Joshua Davis Bland. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CMF P.O. Box 2000, Vacaville, CA by Joshua Davis Bland. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Joshua Davis Bland. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 ADDRESS UPDATED Pursuant to Notice of Change of Address Filed in 1:19-cv-1141-LJO-EPG(HC). (Sant Agata, S)
July 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Joshua-Davis Bland. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02348.
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Joshua-Davis Bland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER.***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by the Clerk on 6/4/19. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson denying #2 Motion to Dismiss Order to pay; Granting extension of time to pay filing fee or file application to proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joshua-Davis Bland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joshua-Davis Bland. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/7/2019. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Court's Order to Stay filed by Joshua-Davis Bland. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Replies due by 6/11/2019. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Scott Kernan (Filing fee $ 400-ifpp). Filed byJoshua-Davis Bland. . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bland v. Kernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Davis Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua-Davis Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?