Zuffa, LLC v. Jaradah et al
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Defendant: Kevin's Lab, Inc., The Lab Bar and Grill and Marwan Jaradah
Case Number: 2:2019cv01323
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/5/2019 DISMISSING this matter with prejudice and without costs to either party. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bronshteyn, Yasha)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* PA 2-165-622 * * UFC 229 Broadcast * * Zuffa, LLC * Copyright #2:* PA 2-165-625 * * UFC 229 Broadcast * * Zuffa, LLC * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 Order re Filing Requirements, #4 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Marwan Jaradah, Kevin's Lab, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Yasha Bronshteyn, Esq.* *Ginzburg & Bronshteyn, APC* *11111 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 1840* *Los Angeles, CA 90025*. (Zignago, K.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Zuffa, LLC. (Bronshteyn, Yasha)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Zuffa, LLC. Attorney Bronshteyn, Yasha added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8358076) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bronshteyn, Yasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuffa, LLC v. Jaradah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin's Lab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lab Bar and Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marwan Jaradah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Represented By: Yasha Bronshteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?