Debeaubien v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Philip Debeaubien
Defendant: Todd Brown, Brent Newman, Reggie Whitehead, State of California and California Highway Patrol
Case Number: 2:2019cv01329
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Julio Antonio Hernandez for California Highway Patrol (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hernandez, Julio)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Todd Brown, California Highway Patrol, Brent Newman, State of California, Reggie Whitehead.(McTavish, Amie)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME for Defendants to file a Responsive Pleading by Todd Brown, et al. (McTavish, Amie) Modified on 7/25/2019 (Huang, H).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Todd Brown, California Highway Patrol, Brent Newman, State of California, Reggie Whitehead (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McTavish, Amie)
July 16, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8360538. (McTavish, Amie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00257861 by all defendants.(McTavish, Amie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debeaubien v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Brown
Represented By: Amie C. McTavish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Newman
Represented By: Amie C. McTavish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie Whitehead
Represented By: Amie C. McTavish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Amie C. McTavish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Represented By: Amie C. McTavish
Represented By: Julio Antonio Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Debeaubien
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?