Rough v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Megan Rough
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01340
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY by Megan Rough in SUPPORT of #5 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Reese, Nathan) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 OPPOSITION by Costco Wholesale Corporation to #5 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Jacobson, David) Modified on 9/5/2019 (York, M).
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the September 19, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Remand #5 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to REMAND to State Court by Megan Rough. Motion Hearing SET for 9/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Reese, Nathan) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Jacobson, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PENDING OTHER CASE by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Attorney Jacobson, David D. added. (Jacobson, David) Modified on 8/14/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Solano, case number FSC052953 by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8362146) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Declaration, #6 Notice of Related Cases, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Vasquez Santos, Jinouth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rough v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Jinouth D. Vasquez Santos
Represented By: David D. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Rough
Represented By: Nathan Jeremy Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?