(PS) Caldwell v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Leah S. Cladwell and Leah S. Caldwell
Defendant: Bejamin Civiletti, Richard L. Thornburgh, Alberto R. Gonzales, Loretta Lynch, Edwin Meese, III, John Ashcroft, Michael B. Mukasey, William P. Barr, Jeff Sessions and Eric Holder
Case Number: 2:2019cv01357
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to DISQUALIFY MAGISTRATE JUDGE and DISTRICT JUDGE and SET ASIDE #6 Order, Findings and Recommendations by Leah S. Caldwell. (Benson, A.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to DISQUALIFY MAGISTRATE JUDGE and DISTRICT JUDGE and SET ASIDE #6 Order, Findings and Recommendations by Leah S. Caldwell. (Benson, A.)
August 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Leah S. Caldwell. (Huang, H)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/26/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and RECOMMENDING that all claims against all defendants should be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Leah S. Caldwell re #1 Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Leah S. Caldwell re #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (York, M)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Leah S. Caldwell re #1 Complaint. (York, M)
July 19, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Coll, A)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Leah S. Caldwell. (Coll, A)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Leah S. Caldwell.(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Caldwell v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah S. Cladwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah S. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bejamin Civiletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Thornburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto R. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Meese, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ashcroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Mukasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?