Cachola et al v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Goff, Pauline Mikhail, Saravie You, Misty Baily, Sharika Williams, Maikel Nagib, Liz Bennett, Devonna Gilmore, Dion R. Lorusso, Robert M. Wilson, Michael Manzone, Bre Michaels, Kim M. Rose, Abel Cachola, Lorna Ruse, Daniel Setiawan, Michelle Perez, Tangerine Ponchione, Jessica Xe, Margee Mae Dela Cruz, Randall Radke, Daniel Rivera II, John Hadi, Kyrollos Mekail, Shivjot Pabla, Nicole Kotecki, Sonal Sehgal, Joe Martinez, Rafaelita Adjei, Maria M. Lorusso, Mahran Izoli, Hardeep Dhillon, Aryan Rabbani, Yvonne Martinez, Brianna Bertrand, Jose L. Delgado, Shaina Larmore, Michelle Dias, Diane Kim, Nikkolae V. Jacinto, Tina Rodriguez, Ahmed Hegazy, Mary Albana, William Shafer, Craig Jensen, Melanie Jipp, Jeanny Keota, Maisha Cherry, Marisol Baez, Leila Vanderwerff, Debbie Schultz, Celia Carton, Steven Chalker, Erin Riffle, Amaris B. Lane, Samantha Andrews, Elisha N. Pennington, Dayna Bowles, Roxanna Hernandez, Jessica Hernandez, Felicia Ivy, Kaitlyn Holdren, Lyna Le and Mitchell Woothen
Defendant: Garfield Beach CVS, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Rx Services, Inc. and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01362
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/12/2019 ADDING attorney Timothy J. Long for CVS Health Corporation. (Huang, H)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/12/2019 ADDING attorney Rowena Santos for CVS Health Corporation. Attorney Michael D. Weil terminated. (Huang, H)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/12/2019 ADDING attorney Timothy J. Long for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Huang, H)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/12/19 ADDING attorney Rowena Santos for Garfield Beach CVS, LLC. (Huang, H)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/12/2019 ADDING attorney Rowena Santos for CVS Rx Services, Inc. (Huang, H)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/12/2019 ADDING attorney Rowena Santos for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Attorney Michael D. Weil terminated. (Huang, H)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/12/2019 ADDING attorney Timothy J. Long for Garfield Beach CVS, LLC. Attorney Michael D. Weil terminated. (Huang, H)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/12/2019 ADDING attorney Timothy J. Long for CVS Rx Services, Inc. Attorney Michael D. Weil terminated. (Huang, H)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Santos, Rowena)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by CVS Health Corporation. (Santos, Rowena)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by CVS Rx Services, Inc.. (Santos, Rowena)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Garfield Beach CVS, LLC. (Santos, Rowena)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 [DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR, TO BE REFILED] SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by CVS Rx Services, Inc.. (Long, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2019 (Coll, A).
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 [DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR, TO BE REFILED] SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Garfield Beach CVS, LLC. (Long, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2019 (Coll, A).
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by CVS Health Corporation. (Long, Timothy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Long, Timothy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by CVS Rx Services, Inc. (Long, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2019 (Reader, L).
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Garfield Beach CVS, LLC. (Long, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2019 (Reader, L).
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 [DISREGARD SEE [ #12 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Long, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2019 (Reader, L).
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 [DISREGARD SEE [ #11 ]SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by CVS Rx Services, Inc. (Long, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2019 (Reader, L).
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 [DISREGARD SEE [ #10 ]SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Garfield Beach CVS, LLC. (Long, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2019 (Reader, L).
August 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice served on Jacob N. Whitehead NCAED. (Donati, J)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE to Plaintiff's Counsel Jacob Whitehead: You are not admitted to practice in the Eastern District of California. Within 5 days from this Clerks Notice, you are DIRECTED to become Admitted to Practice in the Eastern District of California by following the Admission Instructions at: http://www.caed.uscourts.gov/caednew/index.cfm/attorney-info/admission/. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Timothy J. Long for CVS Health Corporation, CVS Rx Services, Inc., Garfield Beach CVS, LLC. (Long, Timothy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Timothy J. Long on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Attorney Long, Timothy J. added. (Long, Timothy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Rx Services, Inc., Garfield Beach CVS, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Weil, Michael)
July 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Jacob N. Whitehead NCAED. (Coll, A)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00256809 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8366566) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Declaration of Howard Kobey)(Weil, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cachola et al v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Goff
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Mikhail
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saravie You
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Baily
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharika Williams
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maikel Nagib
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Bennett
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonna Gilmore
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion R. Lorusso
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Wilson
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Manzone
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bre Michaels
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim M. Rose
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Cachola
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Ruse
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Setiawan
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Perez
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangerine Ponchione
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Xe
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margee Mae Dela Cruz
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Radke
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rivera II
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hadi
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyrollos Mekail
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shivjot Pabla
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Kotecki
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonal Sehgal
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Martinez
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafaelita Adjei
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria M. Lorusso
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahran Izoli
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardeep Dhillon
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aryan Rabbani
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Martinez
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Bertrand
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Delgado
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaina Larmore
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Dias
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Kim
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikkolae V. Jacinto
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Rodriguez
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Hegazy
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Albana
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Shafer
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Jensen
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Jipp
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanny Keota
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maisha Cherry
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Baez
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila Vanderwerff
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Schultz
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Carton
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Chalker
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Riffle
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amaris B. Lane
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Andrews
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisha N. Pennington
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayna Bowles
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanna Hernandez
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hernandez
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Ivy
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Holdren
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyna Le
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Woothen
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead, NCAED
Represented By: Jacob N. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield Beach CVS, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Weil
Represented By: Rowena Santos
Represented By: Timothy J. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Michael D. Weil
Represented By: Rowena Santos
Represented By: Timothy J. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Rx Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Weil
Represented By: Rowena Santos
Represented By: Timothy J. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Weil
Represented By: Rowena Santos
Represented By: Timothy J. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?