(SS) Nelson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christina Marie Nelson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv01382
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Christina Marie Nelson. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Certified Mail Receipts)(Lee, Shanny)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Marriott, Michael K. added. (Marriott, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Christina Marie Nelson.(Lee, Shanny)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 SS Consent Form) (York, M)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Shanny J. Lee* *Law Offices of Harry J. Binder And Charles E. Binder, P.C* *485 Madison Ave., Suite 501* *New York, NY 10022*. (York, M)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Christina Marie Nelson. Attorney Lee, Shanny J. added. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8369267) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties) (Lee, Shanny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Nelson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Marie Nelson
Represented By: Shanny J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?