Lake v. City of Vallejo et al.
Plaintiff: Joseph Lake
Defendant: City of Vallejo Police Department and City of Vallejo
Case Number: 2:2019cv01439
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by City of Vallejo. Attorney Smyth, Timothy R. added.(Smyth, Timothy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of CD of youtube clips re #4 Notice of Lodging. (Coll, A)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: City of Vallejo and City of Vallejo Police Department served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Chau, Wendy) Modified on 8/8/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
August 3, 2019 Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Joseph Lake. (Chau, Wendy)
August 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of LODGING: Video Clip in a CD by Joseph Lake re #1 Complaint. (Chau, Wendy) Modified on 8/8/2019 (Benson, A.).
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Vallejo, City of Vallejo Police Department* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Wendy Ha Chau* *Law Offices of Wendy H. Chau* *580 California Street, Suite 1200* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Huang, H)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Vallejo, and Vallejo Police Department by Joseph Lake. Attorney Chau, Wendy Ha added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8378237) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Chau, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake v. City of Vallejo et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Represented By: Timothy R. Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lake
Represented By: Wendy Ha Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?