Communication Workers of America v. Frontier Communications
Plaintiff: Communication Workers of America
Defendant: Frontier Communications
Case Number: 2:2019cv01456
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the November 14, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #13 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Frontier Communications in re #13 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Gruber, Marina)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to DISMISS Complaint by Frontier Communications. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of April Lloyd, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Gruber, Marina) Modified on 9/20/2019 (Reader, L).
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Communication Workers of America. (Rosenfeld, David)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/10/2019 ORDERING Attorney Ryan T. Sears, to appear for Frontier Communications. (Reader, L)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/10/2019 ORDERING Attorney Christopher J. Murphy, to appear for Frontier Communications. (Reader, L)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Frontier Communications for attorney Ryan T. Sears to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8436348) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gruber, Marina) Modified on 9/3/2019 (York, M).
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Frontier Communications for attorney Christopher J. Murphy to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8436249) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gruber, Marina) Modified on 9/3/2019 (York, M).
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION extending defendant's deadline to file its response to complaint by Frontier Communications. (Gruber, Marina) Modified on 8/22/2019 (Zignago, K.).
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Marina Cristine Gruber on behalf of Frontier Communications. Attorney Gruber, Marina Cristine added. (Gruber, Marina)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Eric Meckley on behalf of Frontier Communications. Attorney Meckley, Eric added. (Meckley, Eric)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Frontier Communications served on 8/1/2019. (Rosenfeld, David) Modified on 8/8/2019 (Huang, H).
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Huang, H)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Frontier Communications* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David A. Rosenfeld* *Weinberg Roger and Rosenfeld* *1001 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 200* *Alameda, CA 94501*. (Huang, H)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frontier Communications by Communication Workers of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenfeld, David)
July 30, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8382366. (Rosenfeld, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Communication Workers of America v. Frontier Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Communications
Represented By: Marina Cristine Gruber
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: Ryan T. Sears, PHV
Represented By: Christopher J. Murphy, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Communication Workers of America
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?