(PC) Bontemps v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Bontemps
Defendant: R. Thomas
Case Number: 2:2019cv01537
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Gregory C. Bontemps. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 9/5/2019 (Plummer, M).
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gregory C. Bontemps. (Kaminski, H)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gregory C. Bontemps. (Coll, A)
August 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP application served on Gregory C. Bontemps. (Henshaw, R)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/13/2019 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. (Henshaw, R)
August 12, 2019 SERVICE BY E-MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gregory C. Bontemps. (Huang, H)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *8/9/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 9/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Huang, H)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against R. Thomas by Gregory C. Bontemps. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bontemps v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Bontemps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?