(HC) Turner v. Elridge
Petitioner: Lafonzo R. Turner
Respondent: Laura Elridge
Case Number: 2:2019cv01577
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST to lift stay and proceed on the first amended complaint by Lafonzo R. Turner. (Reader, L)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
September 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Lafonzo R. Turner. (Henshaw, R)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/10/2019 ORDERING Clerk to assign a District Judge to this case; ORDERING Clerk to serve a copy of the petition with a copy of these findings and recommendations on the Attorney General; and RECOMMENDING #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed without prejudice as duplicative and the District Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Order and Findings and Recommendations, this case has been assigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-1577 KJM GGH (HC). (Henshaw, R)
August 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Lafonzo R. Turner. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Laura Elridge by Lafonzo R. Turner.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Turner v. Elridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lafonzo R. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Laura Elridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?