(SS) Alcala v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jessica Alcala
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv01579
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/24/2019 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, within 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to submit service documents to the United States Marshall. The filing of a notice that plaintiff has submitted service documents to the United States Marshall shall constitute a sufficient response to this order. (Zignago, K.)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 SS Consent Form) (York, M)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Harvey Peter Sackett* *Sackett & Associates, A Professional Law Corporation* *1055 Lincoln Ave.* *San Jose, CA 95125*. (York, M)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/16/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The clerk is DIRECTED to issue process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days from the date of this order. (Copy to: USM.) (York, M)
August 14, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Zignago, K.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jessica Alcala. (Sackett, Harvey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Jessica Alcala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Alcala v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Alcala
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?