(PC) Morgan v. Sacramento Co. Department of Health Service et al
Plaintiff: Sammy Davis Morgan
Defendant: Obshire, Sacramento Co. Department of Health Service and Patricia Lord
Case Number: 2:2019cv01600
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order and prisoner complaint form served on Sammy Davis Morgan. (Henshaw, R)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/8/2019 ORDERING the Clerk to strike #6 Second Copy of Plaintiff's Complaint from the record; DENYING #8 Motion to Supplement the Complaint; and GRANTING Plaintiff 30 days of the service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION of Supplemental Pleading by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Becknal, R)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for SUMMONS by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Huang, H) Modified on 9/11/2019 (Plummer, M). (Response sent: "The court will issue an order regarding service of process in due course.") Modified on 9/11/2019 (Plummer, M).
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 [STRIKEN FROM RECORD PER #9 ORDER] FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all defendants by Sammy Davis Morgan.(Huang, H) Modified on 10/8/2019 (Henshaw, R).
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Huang, H)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Huang, H)
August 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sammy Davis Morgan. (Tupolo, A)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Tupolo, A)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Tupolo, A)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Patricia Lord, Obshire, Sacramento Co. Department of Health Service by Sammy Davis Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Morgan v. Sacramento Co. Department of Health Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Co. Department of Health Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammy Davis Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?