Booth et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: K. C., Renee Booth and Bradley Converse
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01612
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Renee Booth, Bradley Converse, K. C. United States of America served on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Smith, David) Modified on 10/17/2019 (Coll, A).
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Renee Booth, Bradley Converse, K. C.. United States of America served on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Smith, David)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/27/2019 ORDERING attorney Laurie M. Higginbotham, PHV, added for Renee Booth, K. C., and Bradley Converse. (Zignago, K.)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/27/2019 ORDERING attorney Tom Jacob, PHV, added for Renee Booth, K. C., and Bradley Converse. (Zignago, K.)
September 26, 2019 PAYMENT for #5 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8484349. (Smith, David)
September 26, 2019 PAYMENT for #4 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8484294. (Smith, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Renee Booth, K. C., Bradley Converse for attorney Tom Jacob to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Smith, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Renee Booth, K. C., Bradley Converse for attorney Laurie Higginbotham to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Smith, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 KJM Standing Order, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge, #3 VDRP) (Becknal, R)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *David E. Smith* *Smith Zitano Law Firm LLP* *641 Fulton Avenue, Suite 200* *Sacramento, CA 95825*. (Becknal, R)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America by Renee Booth, Bradley Converse, K.C. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8416618) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booth et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. C.
Represented By: David E. Smith
Represented By: Tom Jacob, PHV
Represented By: Laurie M. Higginbotham, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Booth
Represented By: David E. Smith
Represented By: Tom Jacob, PHV
Represented By: Laurie M. Higginbotham, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Converse
Represented By: David E. Smith
Represented By: Tom Jacob, PHV
Represented By: Laurie M. Higginbotham, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?