Sherwood v. Turnstile Capital Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jennica Sherwood
Defendant: Turnstile Capital Management, LLC, Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC and American Coradius International, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01641
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/18/2019: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #7 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Jennica Sherwood. (Heath, Erika)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Heath, Erika)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Turnstile Capital Management, LLC served on 8/30/2019. (Heath, Erika) Modified on 9/10/2019 (Kaminski, H).
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: American Coradius International, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Heath, Erika)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Huang, H)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *American Coradius International, LLC, Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC, Turnstile Capital Management, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Erika Angelos Heath* *Erika Heath, Attorney At Law* *369 Pine Street, Suite 410* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Huang, H)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jennica Sherwood. Attorney Heath, Erika Angelos added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8422382) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Heath, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherwood v. Turnstile Capital Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turnstile Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Coradius International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennica Sherwood
Represented By: Erika Angelos Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?