3 RE4, LLC v. State National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 3 RE4, LLC
Defendant: State National Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01643
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/10/2019 GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of time. Defendant shall have until 9/20/2019, to file its Non-Governmental Corporate Party Disclosure Statement and its Consent/Decline of Magistrate Judge form. (Reader, L)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant State National Insurance Company. (Miglietta, Margaret)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for 14-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to 9/20/2019, to File Consent/Decline to Magistrate Judge and Corporate Disclosure by State National Insurance Company. Attorney Miglietta, Margaret Rose added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miglietta, Margaret) Modified on 9/5/2019 (York, M).
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by State National Insurance Company.(Arnold, Larry)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re #2 New Case Documents by State National Insurance Company. (Arnold, Larry) Modified on 9/3/2019 (York, M).
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by State National Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Arnold, Larry)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Huang, H)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano Superior Court, case number FCS053131 by State National Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8422780) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Arnold, Larry) ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3 RE4, LLC v. State National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3 RE4, LLC
Represented By: Sassoon Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State National Insurance Company
Represented By: Larry M. Arnold
Represented By: Margaret Rose Miglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?